WA HB1866 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning professional development requirements for child day care centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning professional development requirements for child day care centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseGovernor vetoed.
2019-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-01SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-15HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-04HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback