WA HB1858 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for awarding academic credit for military training.
Title
Providing for awarding academic credit for military training.
Sponsors
Sen. John McCoy [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2014-01-31 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2013-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | HE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |