WA HB1854 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transition of medicaid enrollees to skilled nursing facility care.
Title
Concerning the transition of medicaid enrollees to skilled nursing facility care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |