WA HB1851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting taxpayers by providing for accountability and transparency in government contracting.
Title
Protecting taxpayers by providing for accountability and transparency in government contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | APP - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | SEIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |