WA HB1830 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing business definitions for public contracting.
Title
Establishing business definitions for public contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | EDTI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-01-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-19 | CEDT - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-30 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1830&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1830.pdf |