WA HB1813 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporating the costs of employee health benefits into school district contracts for pupil transportation.
Title
Incorporating the costs of employee health benefits into school district contracts for pupil transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |