WA HB1811 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fire benefit charges imposed by cities and towns.
Title
Concerning fire benefit charges imposed by cities and towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | New Code | See Bill Text |