WA HB1810 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the fair servicing and repair of digital electronic products in a safe, secure, reliable, and sustainable manner to increase access to appropriate and affordable digital products, support small businesses and jobs, and enhance digital connectivity in Washington state.
Title
Promoting the fair servicing and repair of digital electronic products in a safe, secure, reliable, and sustainable manner to increase access to appropriate and affordable digital products, support small businesses and jobs, and enhance digital connectivity in Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |