WA HB1764 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing the one percent property tax revenue limit with a limit tied to cost drivers.
Title
Replacing the one percent property tax revenue limit with a limit tied to cost drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-30 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5772 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1764&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1764.pdf |