WA HB1761 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the personal property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the personal property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-02-20HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2024-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-22HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8436110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1761&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1761.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1761-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1761-S%20AMH%20CHRI%20H2820.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1761%20HBA%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1761%20HBR%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66810
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66878
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128905&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30830&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback