WA HB1758 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration date of tax preferences for biofuel, biomass, and energy conservation.
Title
Extending the expiration date of tax preferences for biofuel, biomass, and energy conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-02-19 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB5700 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.