WA HB1717 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 6/30/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 6/30/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the time period for the department of transportation to enter into an agreement for a rail line over the Milwaukee Road corridor. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning a rail line over the Milwaukee Road corridor. )
Title
Extending the time period for the department of transportation to enter into an agreement for a rail line over the Milwaukee Road corridor. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning a rail line over the Milwaukee Road corridor. )
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Effective date 6/30/2009. | |
2009-05-05 | Chapter 338, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |