WA HB1697 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for unannounced visits to homes with dependent children.
Title
Providing for unannounced visits to homes with dependent children.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dickerson [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-22 | Chapter 160, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 77; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-03-11 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-17 | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5393 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.