WA HB1686 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the labeling of biodegradable products that are supported by recognized national or international test methods.
Title
Allowing the labeling of biodegradable products that are supported by recognized national or international test methods.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5852 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-13 - First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | 455 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 455 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |