WA HB1682 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving educational outcomes for homeless students through increased in-school guidance supports, housing stability, and identification services.
Title
Improving educational outcomes for homeless students through increased in-school guidance supports, housing stability, and identification services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 157, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-25 | House | APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2015-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5065 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.