WA HB1682 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning horticultural pest and disease boards.
Title
Concerning horticultural pest and disease boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Daniel Newhouse [R] |
Rep. Charles Ross [R] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-15 | Chapter 96, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-15 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-08 | President signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | ARED - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5764 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.