WA HB1673 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting child welfare workers.
Title
Supporting child welfare workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 14b | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 14b | 005 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 14b | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |