WA HB1671 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disposing of confiscated firearms.
Title
Disposing of confiscated firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1671&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1671.pdf |