WA HB1655 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning provider contract compensation.
Title
Concerning provider contract compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-31 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |