WA HB1632 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013***.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the use of off-road vehicles in certain areas.
Title
Regulating the use of off-road vehicles in certain areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013***. |
2013-07-03 | House | Chapter 23, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2013-07-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-29 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-06-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-28 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-28 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2013-02-01 | House | Held on first reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5513 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.