WA HB1622 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the availability of sexual assault nurse examiner education in rural and underserved areas.
Title
Increasing the availability of sexual assault nurse examiner education in rural and underserved areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 118, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-13 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
SEX OFFENSES AND OFFENDERS
VICTIMS OF CRIMES
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
SEX OFFENSES AND OFFENDERS
VICTIMS OF CRIMES