WA HB1622 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the state building code council.
Title
Concerning the state building code council.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 7/1/2018*. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 207, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |