WA HB1589 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requirements for the correctional personnel and community corrections officer exemption from restrictions on carrying firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning requirements for the correctional personnel and community corrections officer exemption from restrictions on carrying firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-30HouseChapter 231, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-30HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2019-04-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-02SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-20HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback