WA HB1524 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the retainage percentage withheld by prime contractors.
Title
Concerning the retainage percentage withheld by prime contractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5528 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.