WA HB1523 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning renewal of the sales and use tax for transportation benefit districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning renewal of the sales and use tax for transportation benefit districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM.
2021-02-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82140455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback