WA HB1523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the abuse of vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the abuse of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5510 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-16 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1523&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1523.pdf |