WA HB1512 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning lodging-related assessments under chapter 35.87A RCW.
Title
Concerning lodging-related assessments under chapter 35.87A RCW.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 5/10/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 225, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 87a | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 87a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |