WA HB1505 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the alternative jet fuel industry in Washington.
Title
Promoting the alternative jet fuel industry in Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5447 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 330 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 570 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 535 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 535 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |