WA HB1498 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding affordable, resilient broadband service to enable economic development, public safety, health care, and education in Washington's communities.
Title
Expanding affordable, resilient broadband service to enable economic development, public safety, health care, and education in Washington's communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at time TBA. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-02-22 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | ITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5511 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.