WA HB1465 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a dedicated account for elevators, lifting devices, moving walks, manufactured and mobile homes, recreational and commercial vehicles, factory built housing and commercial structures, and contractor registration and compliance activities.
Title
Creating a dedicated account for elevators, lifting devices, moving walks, manufactured and mobile homes, recreational and commercial vehicles, factory built housing and commercial structures, and contractor registration and compliance activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2016-03-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-10 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-06 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-06 | House | GGIT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Gen Govt & Info Tech |
Same As/Similar To
SB5598 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.