WA HB1457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the distribution of aircraft fuel tax revenue.
Title
Concerning the distribution of aircraft fuel tax revenue.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |