WA HB1451 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the entitlement date and definition for the early childhood education and assistance program.
Title
Concerning the entitlement date and definition for the early childhood education and assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 216 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |