WA HB1450 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning involuntary outpatient mental health treatment.
Title
Concerning involuntary outpatient mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015*. |
2015-05-14 | House | Chapter 250, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-19 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5649 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-15 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.