WA HB1445 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of compounding for purposes of the practice of pharmacy.
Title
Concerning the definition of compounding for purposes of the practice of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 78, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-11 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |