WA HB1423 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for academic employee salary increments for community and technical colleges.
Title
Providing for academic employee salary increments for community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-17 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-17 | HE - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5264 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1423&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1423.pdf |