WA SB5264 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for academic employee salary increments for community and technical colleges.
Title
Providing for academic employee salary increments for community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-03 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-03 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5264&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5264.pdf |