WA HB1415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying funding of the medical marijuana authorization database.
Title
Modifying funding of the medical marijuana authorization database.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 220, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-14 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5482 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.