WA HB1409 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale, exchange, transfer, or lease of public property. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Authorizing the sale, exchange, transfer, or lease of public property to Indian tribes. )
Title
Authorizing the sale, exchange, transfer, or lease of public property. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Authorizing the sale, exchange, transfer, or lease of public property to Indian tribes. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Chapter 259, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5208 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.