WA HB1397 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning personal financial affairs statement reporting requirements for elected and appointed officials, candidates, and appointees.
Title
Concerning personal financial affairs statement reporting requirements for elected and appointed officials, candidates, and appointees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-05 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-05 | House | SG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5308 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.