WA HB1392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the cost of child care regulations work group.
Title
Establishing the cost of child care regulations work group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |