WA HB1390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning disclosures regarding incentivized evidence and testimony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning disclosures regarding incentivized evidence and testimony.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB5038 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback