WA SB5038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disclosures regarding incentivized evidence and testimony.
Title
Concerning disclosures regarding incentivized evidence and testimony.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice |
Same As/Similar To
HB1390 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.