WA HB1372 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Replacing the Marcus Whitman statue in the national statuary hall collection with a statue of Billy Frank Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Replacing the Marcus Whitman statue in the national statuary hall collection with a statue of Billy Frank Jr.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 20, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 20, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-19SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-10SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-08HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-04HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5419 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4308New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1372&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1372.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1372-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1372-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1372-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1372-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1372-S%20AMH%20RUDE%20OMLI%20050.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1372%20HBA%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1372%20HBR%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1372%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1372-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1372-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1372-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1372-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1372-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1372-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124050&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28428&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124050&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20State%20Government%20%26amp%3B%20Tribal%20Relations.&mId=28620&isInit=Fa
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124050&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1372&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124050&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28818&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124050&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1372&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback