WA HB1372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the framework for reducing greenhouse gas emissions in Washington based upon best available climate science.
Title
Updating the framework for reducing greenhouse gas emissions in Washington based upon best available climate science.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1372&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1372.pdf |