WA HB1363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Higher Education.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Higher Education.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating workforce investment act references and making no substantive changes.
Title
Updating workforce investment act references and making no substantive changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-08 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5237 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1363&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1363.pdf |