WA HB1356 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing minimum standards for sick and safe leave from employment.
Title
Establishing minimum standards for sick and safe leave from employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | LAB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | LAB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SB5306 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.