WA HB1353 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring free infectious disease testing for good samaritans.
Title
Requiring free infectious disease testing for good samaritans.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-13 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5726 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.