WA HB1345 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding access to K-12 campuses for occupational or educational information.
Title
Regarding access to K-12 campuses for occupational or educational information.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Rep. Michael Hope [R] | Rep. Cathy Dahlquist [R] |
Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5114 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-22 - Effective date 7/28/2013.