WA HB1335 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the unauthorized publication of personal identifying information.
Title
Concerning the unauthorized publication of personal identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Chapter 381, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-03 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5321 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-12 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.