WA HB1317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the public disclosure of global positioning system data corresponding to residential addresses of public employees and volunteers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the public disclosure of global positioning system data corresponding to residential addresses of public employees and volunteers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseReferred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
2018-01-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2017-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-17HouseSEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 9:00 AM.
2017-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government

Same As/Similar To

SB5207 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback